There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Alzheimer's Caregiver Support Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to authorize grants for training and support services for Alzheimer's patients and their families.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/21/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/23/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/21/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/21/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (74)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/21/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 06/21/2017
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/21/2017
Del. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 06/21/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/21/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 06/21/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/28/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/28/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/28/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/13/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/20/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/28/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 09/08/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 10/12/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 11/16/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 03/26/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/23/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/26/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/28/2018
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/16/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce06/21/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/23/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2972. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/21/2017)

Alzheimer's Caregiver Support Act

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to authorize the Department of Health and Human Services to make grants to public and nonprofit private health care providers to expand training and support services for families and caregivers of patients with Alzheimer's disease.