There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the issuance of an Alzheimer's Disease Research Semipostal Stamp.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/21/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
06/23/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/21/2017Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/21/2017Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/21/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (130)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/21/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/21/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 06/21/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 06/21/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 06/21/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/28/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/28/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/28/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/28/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/13/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 07/13/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 07/13/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/13/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/20/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/20/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/20/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 07/28/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 07/28/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/28/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 08/01/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 09/08/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/08/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/08/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 09/08/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 09/08/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/08/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/08/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/08/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/08/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 09/08/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/08/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/08/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/08/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/08/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 09/14/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/14/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 09/14/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/14/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 09/14/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/14/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 09/28/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/28/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/28/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/28/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/28/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 09/28/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/28/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 09/28/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 09/28/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/28/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 09/28/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/02/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 10/02/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/02/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/02/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 10/02/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/02/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/02/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 10/02/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/02/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/02/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/02/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 10/12/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/12/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 10/12/2017
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/12/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 10/12/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 10/12/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 10/12/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/24/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/24/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 10/24/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 11/16/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 11/16/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/21/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce06/21/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/23/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2973. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/21/2017)

This bill directs the United States Postal Service to issue and sell an Alzheimer's Disease Research Semipostal Stamp.

Proceeds from the sale of the stamp must be transferred to the National Institutes of Health.

The stamp must be made available to the public for six years.