Committees: H.R.299 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs01/05/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Markup by
05/08/2018 Markup by
05/18/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-680
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs01/19/2017 Referred to
04/05/2017 Hearings by
05/08/2018 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs06/28/2018 Referred to
08/01/2018 Hearings by