There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program Reform Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Food and Nutrition Act of 2008 to modify the work requirement applicable to able-bodied adults without dependents.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/22/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
07/11/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
06/22/2017Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/22/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (101)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 06/29/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 06/29/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 06/29/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 07/14/2017
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 07/14/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 07/19/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/19/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/19/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 07/19/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/19/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/19/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/25/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/25/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/25/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/25/2017
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/25/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/25/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 07/25/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/25/2017
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 07/26/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 07/26/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/26/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 07/28/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 07/28/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 07/28/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/28/2017
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 08/01/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 08/04/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 08/04/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 08/25/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/06/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/06/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 09/06/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/08/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/08/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 09/08/2017
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 09/08/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/08/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 09/13/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/13/2017
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 09/26/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 09/26/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/26/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 09/26/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/03/2017
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 10/03/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 10/03/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/03/2017
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 10/03/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/03/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 10/06/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 10/06/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/06/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 10/06/2017
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 10/06/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 10/06/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/06/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 10/06/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 10/24/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 10/31/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/09/2017
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 11/09/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 11/15/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 12/04/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 12/11/2017
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 12/14/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 12/19/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 12/19/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 12/19/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/19/2017
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/19/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 12/20/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 12/21/2017
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2] 12/21/2017
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 12/22/2017
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 12/22/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/09/2018
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 01/09/2018
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 01/09/2018
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/09/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/09/2018
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6] 01/09/2018
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/10/2018
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 01/10/2018
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/16/2018
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/16/2018
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 01/16/2018
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/16/2018
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 01/16/2018
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 01/18/2018
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/18/2018
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 01/19/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/19/2018
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 01/22/2018
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/22/2018
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/30/2018
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/05/2018
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/12/2018
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 04/26/2018
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 05/16/2018
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 07/16/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture06/22/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Nutrition07/11/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2996. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/22/2017)

Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program Reform Act of 2017

This bill amends the Food and Nutrition Act of 2008 to modify the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP, formerly known as the food stamp program) work requirements that apply to able-bodied adults without dependents (ABAWDs).

The bill modifies the work requirements to:

  • terminate the authority of the Department of Agriculture to waive the requirements, upon the request of a state agency, for individuals residing in an area that has an unemployment rate of over 10% or does not have a sufficient number of jobs to provide employment for the individuals;
  • shorten from three months to one month the time limit for receiving benefits in a three-year period without meeting the requirements;
  • decrease from 15% to 5% the portion of ABAWDs that a state may exempt from the requirements;
  • allow participation in a supervised job search to satisfy the requirements;
  • require states receiving SNAP funds to provide ABAWDs with opportunities to participate in a work program, a workfare program, or a supervised job search; and
  • reduce SNAP allotments for states that fail to comply with requirements regarding eligibility disqualifications.

The bill also modifies the congressional declaration of policy to specify that the purpose of SNAP is to increase employment, to encourage healthy marriage, and to promote prosperous self-sufficiency (maintaining an income above the poverty level without services and benefits from the federal government).