There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Spending Cuts to Expired and Unnecessary Programs Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Spending Cuts to Expired and Unnecessary Programs Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To rescind certain budget authority proposed to be rescinded in special messages transmitted to the Congress by the President on May 8, 2018, in accordance with title X of the Congressional Budget and Impoundment Control Act 1974.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/07/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 210 - 206 (Roll no. 243).(text: CR H4871-4872)
05/09/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
06/20/2018SenateMotion to discharge Senate Committees on Appropriations; the Budget rejected by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 50. Record Vote Number: 134.
06/20/2018SenateMotion to discharge Senate Committees on Appropriations; the Budget made. (Pursuant to title X of the Congressional Budget and Impoundment Control Act of 1974).
06/11/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred concurrently to the Committee on Appropriations; the Budget pursuant to the order of January 30, 1975, as modified by the order of April 11, 1986, with instructions that the Budget Committee be authorized to report its views to the Appropriations Committee, and that the latter alone be authorized to report the bill.
06/07/2018-9:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/07/2018-9:18pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 210 - 206 (Roll no. 243). (text: CR H4871-4872)
06/07/2018-8:49pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4957)
06/07/2018-3:19pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 3, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. DeLauro demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day.
06/07/2018-3:19pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
06/07/2018-2:17pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3.
06/07/2018-2:17pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 5895 and H.R. 3. The resolution provides for further consideration of H.R. 5895 under a structured rule. Also, the rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3 under a closed rule with one hour of debate. The resolution provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for both bills.
06/07/2018-2:17pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 923. (consideration: CR H4871-4884)
06/07/2018-2:06pmHouseRule H. Res. 923 passed House.
06/06/2018-7:10pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 923 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5895 and H.R. 3. The resolution provides for further consideration of H.R. 5895 under a structured rule. Also, the rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3 under a closed rule with one hour of debate. The resolution provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for both bills.
05/09/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
05/09/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations05/09/2018 Referred to
Senate Appropriations06/11/2018 Referred to
Senate Budget06/11/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/07/2018)

Spending Cuts to Expired and Unnecessary Programs Act

This bill rescinds approximately $15 billion in budget authority over 2018-2028 that was proposed to be rescinded by the President under procedures included in the Impoundment Control Act of 1974.

(A rescission is legislation enacted by Congress that cancels the availability of previously enacted budget authority before the authority would otherwise expire. Under current law, the President may propose rescissions to Congress, which must be enacted into law to take effect. Congress may rescind all, part, or none of the amounts proposed by the President. If Congress does not pass rescission legislation within 45 days of continuous session of Congress, the President must make the funds available.)

The bill rescinds budget authority from specified programs and accounts within:

  • the Department of Agriculture,
  • the Department of Commerce,
  • the Department of Energy,
  • the Department of Health and Human Services,
  • the Department of Housing and Urban Development,
  • the Department of Justice,
  • the Department of Labor,
  • the Department of State,
  • the Millennium Challenge Corporation,
  • the Department of Transportation,
  • the Department of the Treasury,
  • the Corporation for National and Community Service, and
  • the Railroad Retirement Board.