There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

TSP Modernization Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

TSP Modernization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

TSP Modernization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

TSP Modernization Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

TSP Modernization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to provide for flexibility in making withdrawals from a Thrift Savings Plan account, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/17/2017Became Public Law No: 115-84. (TXT | PDF)
11/17/2017Signed by President.
11/08/2017Presented to President.
11/06/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7029)
10/11/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7954)
10/10/2017Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-343.
06/23/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
11/17/2017Became Public Law No: 115-84. (TXT | PDF)
11/17/2017Signed by President.
11/08/2017HousePresented to President.
11/07/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/06/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7029)
10/16/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
10/11/2017-4:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/11/2017-4:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7954)
10/11/2017-3:50pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3031.
10/11/2017-3:50pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7954-7955)
10/11/2017-3:49pmHouseMr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/10/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 248.
10/10/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-343.
07/19/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
07/19/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/23/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
06/23/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/23/2017 Referred to
07/19/2017 Markup by
10/10/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-343

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.3031. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-84 (11/17/2017)


TSP Modernization Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill modifies the rules relating to withdrawals from the Thrift Savings Plan accounts of former federal employees and Members of Congress. Under current law, such employees and Members may make only one partial withdrawal upon reaching age 59-1/2 while employed or one withdrawal after retirement. The bill permits an unlimited number of such withdrawals.

The bill also eliminates: (1) the automatic annuity as a default option if the plan participant does not make an election to establish an annuity, and (2) the limitation on age-based in-service withdrawals.