There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Justin Smith Morrill Congressional Gold Medal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To posthumously award a Congressional gold medal to Justin Smith Morrill, United States Senator of the State of Vermont, in recognition of his lasting contributions to higher education opportunity for all Americans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/23/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/23/2017Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/23/2017Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/23/2017Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E893-894)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/23/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (136)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/23/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/23/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 06/23/2017
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 06/23/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 06/23/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/14/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 07/14/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/14/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/14/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 07/14/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/14/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/14/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/14/2017
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/28/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/14/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 10/02/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 10/02/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/02/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/02/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/02/2017
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 10/02/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/04/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 10/04/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/04/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/04/2017
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/04/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 10/04/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/10/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/10/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/10/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/10/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 10/12/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/12/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/12/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 10/12/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/12/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/12/2017
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/12/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 10/12/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/12/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/19/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/19/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 10/19/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/19/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 10/19/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/19/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 10/26/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 10/26/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 10/26/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 10/26/2017
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/26/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 11/01/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 11/01/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/08/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/08/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/08/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 11/16/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 11/16/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 12/05/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 12/05/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 12/20/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/20/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/20/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 12/20/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 12/20/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/20/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 12/20/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 12/20/2017
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 12/20/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/20/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 01/11/2018
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/01/2018
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/01/2018
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/01/2018
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 03/01/2018
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 03/01/2018
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/28/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/28/2018
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 08/03/2018
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 08/10/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 08/10/2018
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 08/10/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/12/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 10/12/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/12/2018
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/12/2018
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/12/2018
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 10/12/2018
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/12/2018
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 10/16/2018
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 10/16/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/16/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/16/2018
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 10/23/2018
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/23/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 10/23/2018
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/23/2018
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 11/20/2018
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 11/20/2018
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 11/20/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 11/20/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/20/2018
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/20/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 11/20/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 11/20/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services06/23/2017 Referred to
House Administration06/23/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3034.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3034. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/23/2017)

Justin Smith Morrill Congressional Gold Medal Act

This bill requires the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to posthumously award a Congressional Gold Medal to Justin Smith Morrill, a United States Senator from Vermont, for his lasting contributions to higher education opportunity for all Americans.