There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Protecting Patient Access to Emergency Medications Act of 2017

Other Short Titles

Protecting Patient Access to Emergency Medications Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Patient Access to Emergency Medications Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Patient Access to Emergency Medications Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Protecting Patient Access to Emergency Medications Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Controlled Substances Act with regard to the provision of emergency medical services.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
11/17/2017Became Public Law No: 115-83. (TXT | PDF)
11/17/2017Signed by President.
11/07/2017Presented to President.
11/02/2017Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate Amendment: CR H8421-8422)
10/24/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/24/2017Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/09/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 404 - 0 (Roll no. 25).(text: CR H206-207)
01/05/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
11/17/2017Became Public Law No: 115-83. (TXT | PDF)
11/17/2017Signed by President.
11/07/2017HousePresented to President.
11/02/2017-5:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/02/2017-5:13pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate Amendment: CR H8421-8422)
11/02/2017-5:13pmHouseMr. Hudson asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H8421-8422)
10/25/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/24/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/24/2017SenateS.Amdt.1577 Amendment SA 1577 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/24/2017SenateS.Amdt.1577 Amendment SA 1577 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cassidy. (consideration: CR S6773) In the nature of substitute.
10/24/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6773)
10/24/2017SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/12/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/10/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
01/09/2017-7:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/09/2017-7:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 404 - 0 (Roll no. 25). (text: CR H206-207)
01/09/2017-6:57pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H218)
01/09/2017-5:07pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
01/09/2017-5:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 304.
01/09/2017-5:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H206-208)
01/09/2017-5:00pmHouseMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/05/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/05/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/05/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/05/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary01/05/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations01/12/2017 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions01/10/2017 Referred to
10/24/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.304. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-83 (11/17/2017)

Protecting Patient Access to Emergency Medications Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act to direct the Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA) to register an emergency medical services (EMS) agency to administer controlled substances if the agency submits an application demonstrating that it is authorized to conduct such activity in the state in which the agency practices. The DEA may deny an application if it determines that the registration is inconsistent with the public interest.

An EMS agency may obtain a single registration in each state instead of a separate registration for each location.

A registered EMS agency may deliver, store, and receive controlled substances, subject to specified conditions.

An EMS professional of a registered EMS agency may administer controlled substances in schedules II, III, IV, or V outside the physical presence of a medical director if such administration is authorized under state law and pursuant to a standing or verbal order, subject to specified conditions.

The bill specifies that a hospital-based EMS agency (i.e., an EMS agency owned or operated by a hospital) may continue to administer controlled substances under the hospital's DEA registration.