There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fair Representation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the use of ranked choice voting in elections for Representatives in Congress, to require each State with more than one Representative to establish multi-member Congressional districts, to require States to conduct Congressional redistricting through independent commissions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/26/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
07/14/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/26/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/17/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/09/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/07/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/26/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice07/14/2017 Referred to
Committee on House Administration06/26/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3057. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/26/2017)

Fair Representation Act

This bill requires (1) that ranked choice voting (a system in which voters rank candidates in order of preference) be used for all elections for Members of the House of Representatives, (2) that states entitled to six or more Representatives establish districts such that three to five Representatives are elected from each district, and (3) that states entitled to fewer than six Representatives elect all Representatives on an at-large basis.

The bill also requires that congressional redistricting be conducted in accordance with a plan developed by (1) a state-established independent commission; or (2) if such a commission is not enacted, a three-judge panel of the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia.