There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Community Health Center and Primary Care Workforce Expansion Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide funding for Federally Qualified Health Centers, the National Health Service Corps, Teaching Health Centers, and the Nurse Practitioner Residency Training program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/26/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/30/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/26/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 06/26/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/29/2017
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 06/29/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/29/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/29/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/29/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 06/29/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/29/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/29/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/29/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/29/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/29/2017
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 06/29/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/29/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 06/29/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/29/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/29/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/29/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/29/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/14/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/14/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/28/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/05/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/17/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/26/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/30/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3059. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/26/2017)

Community Health Center and Primary Care Workforce Expansion Act of 2017

This bill amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to make appropriations for and extend indefinitely: (1) enhanced funding for the community health centers program and the National Health Service Corps, and (2) grants for federally qualified health centers and nurse-managed health centers to train family nurse practitioners to become primary care providers. The bill makes appropriations for capital projects under the community health centers program.

The bill amends the Public Health Service Act to make appropriations for and extend indefinitely a program that pays teaching health centers to establish or expand graduate medical residency training programs.