There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Audit the Pentagon Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reduce by one-half of one percent the discretionary budget authority of the Department of Defense for a fiscal year if the financial statement of the Department of Defense for the previous fiscal year does not receive a qualified or unqualified audit opinion by an external independent auditor, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/27/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/27/2017Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 06/27/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/27/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 06/27/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/11/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/11/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 07/11/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/20/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/20/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/05/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/14/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/14/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/14/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/27/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/26/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/06/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/06/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 11/16/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 12/07/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/07/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 12/14/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 01/09/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 01/17/2018
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/05/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 08/31/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services06/27/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3079.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3079. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/27/2017)

Audit the Pentagon Act of 2017

This bill requires a .5% reduction in Department of Defense (DOD) discretionary budget authority if DOD has not submitted a financial statement by March 2 of a fiscal year for the previous fiscal year or such financial statement has not received an unqualified or qualified audit opinion by an independent auditor. This reduction does not apply to military, reserve, and National Guard personnel accounts or the Defense Health Program account. The bill permits the President to waive any reduction in DOD budget authority if the reduction would harm national security or military personnel deployed in combat zones.