There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Honest Fishermen Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To strengthen Federal consumer protection and product traceability with respect to commercially marketed seafood, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/29/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
08/09/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/24/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/17/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/30/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/29/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/29/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/30/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture06/29/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture07/24/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources06/29/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans08/09/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/29/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade07/17/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3108.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.