There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Superior National Forest Land Exchange Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Superior National Forest Land Exchange Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Superior National Forest Land Exchange Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for a land exchange involving Federal land in the Superior National Forest in Minnesota acquired by the Secretary of Agriculture through the Weeks Law, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/28/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 309 - 99 (Roll no. 639).(text: CR H9445-9446)
09/05/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-287.
06/29/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
11/29/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
11/28/2017-7:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/28/2017-7:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 309 - 99 (Roll no. 639). (text: CR H9445-9446)
11/28/2017-6:57pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9455)
11/28/2017-5:03pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/28/2017-4:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3115.
11/28/2017-4:52pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9445-9448)
11/28/2017-4:52pmHouseMr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/05/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 206.
09/05/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-287.
07/26/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 10.
07/26/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/14/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
07/07/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/07/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/29/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
06/29/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/29/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
09/05/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-287
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands07/07/2017 Referred to
07/14/2017 Hearings by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources07/07/2017 Referred to
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry11/29/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3115.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3115. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/28/2017)

Superior National Forest Land Exchange Act of 2017

(Sec. 4) This bill directs the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to convey specified National Forest System land within the Superior National Forest in St. Louis County, Minnesota, to Poly Met Mining Corporation, Inc., in exchange for specified nonfederal lands within the forest in St. Louis and Lake Counties, Minnesota.

Poly Met shall pay or reimburse all land survey, appraisal, land title, deed preparation, and other costs incurred by USDA in completing such exchange. All of the funds paid or reimbursed to USDA must be deposited into accounts and used for the purposes specified in certain collection agreements pertaining to such exchange.

The United States shall reserve the mineral rights on a specified portion of the federal land exchanged.

As set forth in the Final Record of Decision of January 9, 2017, approving such exchange, Poly Met shall honor existing road and transmission line authorizations on the federal land exchanged.

(Sec. 5) The appraised values of the federal and nonfederal lands that were determined and approved by USDA in November 2015 shall be the values used to complete the exchange and shall not be subject to reappraisal. Poly Met shall waive any payment otherwise owed to it by the United States to equalize the values of the exchanged lands. Such waiver shall be considered as a voluntary donation to the United States by Poly Met for all purposes of law.

(Sec. 7) Upon conveyance, the non-federal lands shall become part of the Superior National Forest and shall be managed in accordance with the Weeks Law and in a manner consistent with the land and resource management plan applicable to adjacent federally owned lands in the forest.

Upon conveyance, the federal land shall: (1) become private land and shall be made available for any lawful use in accordance with applicable federal, state, and local laws and regulations that pertain to mining and other uses of land in private ownership; and (2) be withdrawn from appropriation and disposal under public land laws and under laws relating to mineral and geothermal leasing.