There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Transparency and Honesty in Energy Regulations Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the Secretary of Energy, the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency, the Secretary of the Interior, and the Chair of the Council on Environmental Quality from considering the social cost of carbon, the social cost of methane, or the social cost of nitrous oxide, in taking any action, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/02/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-999, Part I.
06/29/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date All Actions
11/02/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-999, Part I.
11/30/2017Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 15.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/30/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/29/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/29/2017Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
07/27/2017Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
07/17/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/30/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/29/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/29/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 06/29/2017
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/11/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 07/11/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/24/2017
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 07/25/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 07/26/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 07/27/2017
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 07/27/2017
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 07/27/2017
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 08/01/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 08/22/2017
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/08/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/11/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 09/12/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/12/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/12/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/12/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 09/25/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/25/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/27/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/04/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/05/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/12/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 10/23/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 10/24/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/24/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 10/25/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 10/25/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 10/25/2017
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/25/2017
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/01/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 11/01/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/03/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/06/2017
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/08/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/08/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 11/29/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce06/29/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment06/30/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources06/29/2017 Referred to
11/29/2017 Markup by
11/30/2017 Markup by
11/02/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-999
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources07/17/2017 Referred to
07/27/2017 Hearings by
11/29/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3117. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/29/2017)

Transparency and Honesty in Energy Regulations Act of 2017

This bill prohibits the Department of Energy, the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA), the Department of the Interior, and the Council on Environmental Quality from considering the social cost of carbon, methane, or nitrous oxide as part of any cost benefit analysis in the rule making process, unless a federal law is enacted authorizing such consideration. They may also consider those social costs if they use an estimate that: (1) complies with the requirements of the Office of Management and Budget's "Circular A-4" document; (2) uses the discount rates of three and seven percent specified in that document; (3) considers only the domestic costs and benefits of the activity; and (4) uses only the most up to date and empirically estimated equilibrium climate sensitivity distributions, and realistic time horizons.

The EPA must report on the number of proposed and final rulemakings, guidance documents, and agency actions since January 2009 that use those social costs, including as part of any cost benefit analysis required under Executive Order 12866 or other relevant authority.