There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

All-American Flag Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

All-American Flag Act

Short Titles as Introduced

All-American Flag Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the purchase of domestically made flags of the United States of America for use by the Federal Government.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/29/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9716-9717)
11/27/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-1044.
06/29/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/03/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
11/29/2018-5:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/29/2018-5:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9716-9717)
11/29/2018-5:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3121.
11/29/2018-5:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9716-9717)
11/29/2018-5:28pmHouseMr. Comer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/27/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 811.
11/27/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-1044.
11/02/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
11/02/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
06/29/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
06/29/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 11/03/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/04/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/29/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Markup by
11/27/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1044
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs12/03/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3121.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3121. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/29/2018)

All-American Flag Act

(Sec. 2) This bill prohibits agencies from using funds to procure a U.S. flag unless such flag has been 100% manufactured in the United States from materials that have been grown or 100% U.S. produced or manufactured.

This prohibition does not apply if an agency determines that satisfactory quality and sufficient quantity of U.S. flags cannot be procured as needed at U.S. market prices.

Nor shall such prohibition apply to procurements:

  • by vessels in foreign waters;
  • for resale purposes in any military commissary, military exchange, or non-appropriated fund instrumentality operated by an agency; or
  • for amounts less than the simplified acquisition threshold.

The President: (1) may waive the prohibition upon determining that a waiver is necessary to comply with a trade agreement, and (2) shall publish a notice in the Federal Register within 30 days of granting a waiver.