There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

All-American Flag Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the purchase of domestically made flags of the United States of America for use by the Federal Government.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/29/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
11/02/2017 Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
11/02/2017 Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
06/29/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 11/03/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/04/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/29/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Markup by

Related Bills (0)

As of 12/11/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3121 - All-American Flag Act.

Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3121. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/29/2017)

All-American Flag Act

This bill requires U.S. flags acquired for use by the federal government to be manufactured entirely in the United States from articles, materials, or supplies grown, produced, or manufactured in the United States.

Such requirement shall not apply if: (1) articles, materials, or supplies to be used are not grown, produced, or manufactured in the United States in sufficient and reasonably available commercial quantities and are not of a satisfactory quality; or (2) the President determines a waiver is necessary to comply with a trade agreement.