There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans Care Financial Protection Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Care Financial Protection Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans Care Financial Protection Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Care Financial Protection Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans Care Financial Protection Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to include on the internet website of the Department of Veterans Affairs a warning regarding dishonest, predatory, or otherwise unlawful practices targeting individuals who are eligible for increased pension on the basis of need for regular aid and attendance, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To protect individuals who are eligible for increased pension under laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs on the basis of need of regular aid and attendance from dishonest, predatory, or otherwise unlawful practices, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
03/09/2018Became Public Law No: 115-131. (TXT | PDF)
03/09/2018Signed by President.
02/28/2018Presented to President.
02/15/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
02/15/2018Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1191)
11/06/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8505)
11/06/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-385.
06/29/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/09/2018Became Public Law No: 115-131. (TXT | PDF)
03/09/2018Signed by President.
02/28/2018HousePresented to President.
02/16/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/15/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
02/15/2018SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1191)
11/07/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/06/2017-5:00pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/06/2017-5:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/06/2017-5:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8505)
11/06/2017-4:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3122.
11/06/2017-4:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8505-8507)
11/06/2017-4:49pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/06/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 282.
11/06/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-385.
10/12/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/13/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
06/29/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/29/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/29/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/29/2017 Referred to
10/12/2017 Markup by
11/06/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-385
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs06/29/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Hearings by
Senate Veterans' Affairs11/07/2017 Referred to
02/15/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3122. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-131 (03/09/2018)

Veterans Care Financial Protection Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs to include on its Internet website a warning to veterans relating to dishonest, predatory, or otherwise unlawful practices targeting individuals who are eligible for increased pension on the basis of need for regular aid and attendance.

The Government Accountability Office shall:

  • complete a study on financial exploitation of veterans, which shall include an analysis of the types of financial exploitation facing such veterans and any gaps in efforts to address these issues and an analysis of the types of standards used by federal and state agencies intended to protect vulnerable populations from financial exploitation; and
  • submit a preliminary report and a final report to Congress.