There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Preventing Diabetes in Medicare Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to reduce the occurrence of diabetes in Medicare beneficiaries by extending coverage under Medicare for medical nutrition therapy services to such beneficiaries with pre-diabetes or with risk factors for developing type 2 diabetes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/29/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
07/17/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/30/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/29/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 06/29/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/29/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/29/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/29/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/27/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 08/25/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 08/25/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 08/25/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 08/25/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 08/25/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/06/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/13/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/13/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/05/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/23/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/23/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/23/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/26/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/07/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 11/07/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/09/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/06/2018
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/26/2018
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/26/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/09/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/06/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/15/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/20/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/26/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/25/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 09/05/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/05/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/05/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/07/2018
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/27/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 10/02/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/29/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/30/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/29/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health07/17/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3124. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/29/2017)

Preventing Diabetes in Medicare Act of 2017

This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to extend Medicare coverage for medical nutrition therapy services to beneficiaries with pre-diabetes or risk factors for developing type-2 diabetes.