There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

CHANCE in TECH Act
CHampioning Apprenticeships for New Careers and Employees in TECHnology Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Labor to enter into contracts with industry intermediaries for purposes of promoting the development of and access to apprenticeships in the technology sector, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/10/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/10/2017Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/10/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 07/10/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 07/10/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4]* 07/10/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/12/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 07/13/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 07/18/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/18/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/18/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 07/18/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/18/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/18/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/20/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/20/2017
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/24/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/28/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 07/28/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 08/15/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 08/22/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/05/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/26/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/26/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/03/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 11/13/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 11/14/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/16/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 01/10/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 01/10/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/08/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/14/2018
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 02/14/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/16/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 02/16/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/16/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/16/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 02/16/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/27/2018
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 03/05/2018
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 03/05/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 03/05/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/07/2018
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/20/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 04/10/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 04/16/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/17/2018
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-18] 04/27/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/22/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce07/10/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3174. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/10/2017)

CHampioning Apprenticeships for New Careers and Employees in TECHnology Act or the CHANCE in TECH Act

This bill requires the Department of Labor to enter into competitive contracts with industry intermediaries to promote the development of and access to apprenticeships in the technology sector.

The Department of Education may issue CHANCE in TECH Awards for 21st Century Schools to secondary schools or junior or community colleges that demonstrate high achievement in providing students necessary skills to compete in the 21st century workforce.