There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Medicare Part B Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Part B Improvement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to improve the delivery of home infusion therapy and dialysis and the application of the Stark rule under the Medicare program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/25/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6233-6235)
07/25/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-254, Part I.
07/11/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/26/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
07/25/2017-2:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2017-2:14pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6233-6235)
07/25/2017-1:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3178.
07/25/2017-1:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6233-6239)
07/25/2017-1:41pmHouseMr. Brady (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/25/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-254, Part I.
07/14/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/13/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/13/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/11/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/11/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/11/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/11/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce07/11/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/14/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/11/2017 Referred to
07/13/2017 Markup by
07/25/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-254
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health07/11/2017 Referred to
Senate Finance07/26/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3178. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/25/2017)

Medicare Part B Improvement Act of 2017

TITLE I--IMPROVEMENTS IN PROVISION OF HOME INFUSION THERAPY

(Sec. 101) This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to temporarily provide for transitional Medicare payment with respect to certain home infusion services furnished on or after January 1, 2019. Under current law, the Center for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) is required to establish a permanent payment system with respect to such services furnished on or after January 1, 2021.

(Sec. 102) The bill extends the Medicare Intravenous Immune Globulin demonstration project through 2020, subject to the availability of funds. A Medicare beneficiary who is enrolled in the project on September 30, 2017, shall be automatically reenrolled, subject to an existing cap on project participants.

(Sec. 103)  Documentation created by an orthotist or prosthetist shall be considered part of a Medicare beneficiary's medical record for purposes of determining the reasonableness and medical necessity of orthotics and prosthetics.

TITLE II--IMPROVEMENTS IN DIALYSIS SERVICES

(Sec. 201) The bill allows renal dialysis facilities to be accredited by a CMS-approved accreditation body for participation in the Medicare program. The bill also establishes a  time frame with respect to initial surveys of renal dialysis facilities.

(Sec. 202) A Medicare beneficiary who has end-stage renal disease (ESRD) and is receiving home dialysis may choose to receive monthly ESRD-related visits via telehealth, provided that the beneficiary also receives face-to-face visits periodically. Specified facility fees and geographic requirements shall not apply with respect to the provision of such services via telehealth.

The Government Accountability Office must study and report to Congress on the further expansion of Medicare coverage of renal dialysis services furnished via telehealth.

TITLE III--IMPROVEMENTS IN APPLICATION OF STARK RULE

(Sec. 301) The bill codifies certain CMS rules regarding signature requirements and holdover arrangements as they relate to prohibitions against physician self-referrals.

(Sec. 302) The bill reduces annual funding available to the Medicare Improvement Fund beginning in FY2021.