There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Every Kid Outdoors Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish an Every Kid Outdoors program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/11/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
08/08/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/24/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/24/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/12/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/11/2017 Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/11/2017 Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/11/2017 Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/11/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 07/11/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/11/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 07/11/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/20/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/20/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/20/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/20/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/20/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/20/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/20/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/20/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/20/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/20/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/20/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/20/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/20/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/20/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/20/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/20/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/20/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/27/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/27/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/27/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/27/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/27/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/27/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 07/28/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/28/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/28/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/28/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/28/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/28/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/28/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/28/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 07/28/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/28/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/01/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/04/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 08/11/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 08/11/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 08/29/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 08/29/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/06/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/25/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/25/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 09/25/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 09/26/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/28/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/11/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 10/16/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 11/13/2017

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/11/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands07/24/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans07/24/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture07/11/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry08/08/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/11/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment07/12/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3186. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/11/2017)

Every Kid Outdoors Act

This bill directs the Departments of the Interior, Agriculture, Commerce, and the Army to establish the Every Kids Outdoors program to provide fourth graders free access to federal lands and waters to which the public has access.

Such Departments shall issue such students annual passes, upon request, which shall allow free access to:

  • a per-vehicle fee area for the student and any passengers accompanying the student in a private, noncommercial vehicle or for up to three adults accompanying the student on bicycles; or
  • a per-person fee area for the student and up to three adults accompanying the student.

In carrying out such program, such departments:

  • may collaborate with state park systems that opt to implement a complementary Every Kid Outdoors State park pass,
  • shall maintain a publicly available website that provides information about the program,
  • may provide visitor services, and
  • may support approved partners of the federal lands and waters by furnishing them with opportunities for participation in the program.