There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

PUPPERS Act of 2017
Preventing Unkind and Painful Procedures and Experiments on Respected Species Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to prohibit the Secretary of Veterans Affairs from conducting medical research causing significant pain or distress to dogs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
07/12/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/12/2017Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/12/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (101)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 07/19/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/19/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/19/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/19/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/24/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/24/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 07/24/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/24/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/24/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 07/24/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/24/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 07/24/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/24/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/27/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/27/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/27/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/27/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/27/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/27/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 07/28/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 07/28/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 07/28/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/28/2017
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 07/28/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/28/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/15/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/15/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 08/15/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 08/15/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/15/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/15/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 08/15/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/11/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/11/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/11/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/11/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 09/11/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 09/11/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 09/11/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 09/18/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 09/25/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/25/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 09/28/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 09/28/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/28/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 09/28/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 10/23/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/23/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/24/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 11/24/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/24/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 11/24/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 12/04/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/04/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 12/21/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 01/09/2018
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 02/05/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/13/2018
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/13/2018
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 02/15/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 02/26/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/26/2018
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 03/01/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/01/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/01/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 03/13/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/13/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/13/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/13/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/23/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 03/23/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/23/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/05/2018
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/05/2018
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/27/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/15/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/25/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/25/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/25/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/26/2018
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/26/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 10/02/2018
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/19/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/26/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/26/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/26/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/26/2018
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/26/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/26/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 10/26/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/13/2018
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 11/13/2018
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 11/27/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 11/27/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 12/10/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 12/10/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs07/12/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health07/12/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3197.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3197. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/12/2017)

Preventing Unkind and Painful Procedures and Experiments on Respected Species Act of 2017 or the PUPPERS Act of 2017

This bill prohibits the Department of Veterans Affairs, in carrying out research within the Veterans Health Administration, from purchasing, breeding, transporting, housing, feeding, maintaining, disposing of, or experimenting on dogs as part of the conduct of any study that causes significant pain or distress.