There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Zero Tolerance for Domestic Abusers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect victims of stalking from gun violence.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
08/03/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/12/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/12/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (121)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/06/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/06/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/06/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/06/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/06/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/06/2018
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/06/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/06/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/06/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/06/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/06/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/06/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/06/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 03/06/2018
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/06/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/06/2018
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/06/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/06/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 03/06/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/06/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/06/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/07/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/07/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/07/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 03/09/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 03/09/2018
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 03/09/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/09/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/09/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/14/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/14/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/14/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/14/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/14/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/14/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/14/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 03/14/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/19/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/19/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/19/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/19/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/19/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/19/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/19/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/20/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 03/20/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 03/20/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/20/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/20/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/20/2018
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/22/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/22/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/22/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/22/2018
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/22/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 03/22/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 03/22/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 04/05/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 04/05/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/05/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/05/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/05/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/05/2018
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/05/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/05/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/05/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/05/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/10/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/10/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/10/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/10/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/11/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/11/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 04/11/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/11/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 04/11/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/11/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/18/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 04/18/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 04/18/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/18/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 04/25/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/25/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 04/25/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/25/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/25/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 04/25/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/25/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/25/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/25/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/09/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/09/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/09/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 05/09/2018
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/09/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/09/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/15/2018
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 05/15/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/06/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/06/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 06/06/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/06/2018
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 06/06/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/12/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/12/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/20/2018
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/20/2018
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 06/20/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/10/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/10/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/10/2018
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-18] 07/24/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/24/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 07/24/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 07/24/2018
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 09/04/2018
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/04/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/04/2018
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 12/03/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/03/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/12/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations08/03/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3207. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/12/2017)

Zero Tolerance for Domestic Abusers Act

This bill amends the federal criminal code to:

  • state that the term "intimate partner" includes a dating partner and any other person subject to a protection order under state domestic or family violence law; and
  • expand the term "misdemeanor crime of domestic violence" to include the use or attempted use of physical force, or the threatened use of a deadly weapon, by a current or former intimate partner.

The bill makes it a crime to knowingly sell or dispose of a firearm to a person who has been convicted of a misdemeanor crime of stalking. It also makes it a crime for such convicted stalker to receive or possess a firearm.