There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Inspiring the Next Space Pioneers, Innovators, Researchers, and Explorers (INSPIRE) Women Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Inspiring the Next Space Pioneers, Innovators, Researchers, and Explorers (INSPIRE) Women Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Inspiring the Next Space Pioneers, Innovators, Researchers, and Explorers (INSPIRE) Women Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Inspiring the Next Space Pioneers, Innovators, Researchers, and Explorers (INSPIRE) Women Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Inspiring the Next Space Pioneers, Innovators, Researchers, and Explorers (INSPIRE) Women Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To inspire women to enter the aerospace field, including science, technology, engineering, and mathematics, through mentorship and outreach.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
02/28/2017Became Public Law No: 115-7. (TXT | PDF)
02/28/2017Signed by President.
02/16/2017Presented to President.
02/14/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S1163)
02/01/2017Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. Without written report.
01/10/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H270)
01/05/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
02/28/2017Became Public Law No: 115-7. (TXT | PDF)
02/28/2017Signed by President.
02/16/2017HousePresented to President.
02/15/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/14/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1163)
02/01/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 6.
02/01/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
01/24/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
01/11/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
01/10/2017-4:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/10/2017-4:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H270)
01/10/2017-3:47pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 321.
01/10/2017-3:47pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H270-273)
01/10/2017-3:47pmHouseMrs. Comstock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/05/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
01/05/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8]* 01/05/2017
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 01/05/2017
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 01/09/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/09/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 01/09/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 01/09/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 01/09/2017
Rep. Taylor, Scott [R-VA-2] 01/09/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/09/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 01/09/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 01/09/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/09/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/09/2017
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/09/2017
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 01/09/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/09/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/09/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 01/09/2017
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 01/09/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/09/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/09/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/09/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/09/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/09/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/09/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/09/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/09/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology01/05/2017 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/11/2017 Referred to
01/24/2017 Markup by
02/01/2017 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.321. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-7 (02/28/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

Inspiring the Next Space Pioneers, Innovators, Researchers, and Explorers (INSPIRE) Women Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) to encourage women and girls to study science, technology, engineering, and mathematics (STEM), pursue careers in aerospace, and further advance the nation's space science and exploration efforts through support of the following initiatives:

  • NASA GIRLS and NASA BOYS;
  • Aspire to Inspire; and
  • Summer Institute in Science, Technology, Engineering, and Research.

(Sec. 4) NASA shall submit to Congress a specified plan on how NASA can best facilitate and support both current and retired astronauts, scientists, engineers, and innovators, including early career female astronauts, scientists, engineers, and innovators, to engage with K-12 female STEM students and inspire the next generation of women to consider participating in STEM fields and to pursue careers in aerospace.