There are 8 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (15)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

SECRET Act of 2018
Securely Expediting Clearances Through Reporting Transparency Act of 2018

Other Short Titles

SECRET Act of 2018
Securely Expediting Clearances Through Reporting Transparency Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

SECRET Act of 2017
Securely Expediting Clearances Through Reporting Transparency Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

SECRET Act of 2017
Securely Expediting Clearances Through Reporting Transparency Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

SECRET Act of 2017
Securely Expediting Clearances Through Reporting Transparency Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

SECRET Act of 2018
Securely Expediting Clearances Through Reporting Transparency Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

SECRET Act of 2017
Securely Expediting Clearances Through Reporting Transparency Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Director of the National Background Investigations Bureau to submit a report on the backlog of personnel security clearance investigations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
05/22/2018Became Public Law No: 115-173. (TXT | PDF)
05/22/2018Signed by President.
05/10/2018Presented to President.
05/07/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment)
03/15/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S1768-1769)
11/27/2017Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-185.
07/26/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6327)
07/25/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-258.
07/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/22/2018Became Public Law No: 115-173. (TXT | PDF)
05/22/2018Signed by President.
05/10/2018HousePresented to President.
05/07/2018-5:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/07/2018-5:22pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment)
05/07/2018-5:21pmHouseMr. Russell asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H3760-3761)
03/15/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/15/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1768-1769)
03/15/2018SenateS.Amdt.2210 Amendment SA 2210 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
03/15/2018SenateS.Amdt.2210 Amendment SA 2210 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S1769-1770; text: CR S1769-1770) In the nature of a substitute.
03/15/2018SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
03/15/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1768-1770)
11/27/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 264.
11/27/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-185.
10/04/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/27/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
07/26/2017-2:21pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/26/2017-2:21pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6327)
07/26/2017-2:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3210.
07/26/2017-2:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6327-6328)
07/26/2017-2:06pmHouseMr. Mitchell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/25/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 188.
07/25/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-258.
07/19/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
07/19/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
07/12/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
07/12/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/12/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform07/12/2017 Referred to
07/19/2017 Markup by
07/25/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-258
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/27/2017 Referred to
10/04/2017 Markup by
11/27/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-185

No related bill information was received for H.R.3210.


Latest Summary (7)

There are 7 summaries for H.R.3210. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-173 (05/22/2018)


Securely Expediting Clearances Through Reporting Transparency Act of
2018 or the SECRET Act of 2018

(Sec. 3) This bill requires the National Background Investigations Bureau (NBIB) within the Office of Personnel Management (OPM) to report on its backlog of security clearance investigations. The report must include a backlog mitigation plan identifying the cause of, and making recommendations to remedy, the backlog.

(Sec. 4) The Executive Office of the President must report on the process for conducting and adjudicating security clearance investigations for the President's staff.

(Sec. 5) The OPM must report on the costs of maintaining comprehensive background investigations capability within both the NBIB and the Department of Defense, compared to the costs of sustaining a single government-wide background investigations enterprise.

(Sec. 6) The Office of the Director of National Intelligence (ODNI) must report on: (1) the status of implementing government-wide continuous evaluation programs, (2) efforts by federal agencies to meet requirements for reciprocal recognition to access classified information, and (3) whether the schedule for processing security clearances should be modified.

(Sec. 7) The ODNI and the OPM must review and make recommendations to Congress and the President, as appropriate, to issue guidance to assist agencies in determining: (1) position sensitivity designation, and (2) the appropriate background investigation to initiate for each position designation. The President must report on any issues identified in, and the number of position designations revised as a result of, the review.