There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Anti-Voter Suppression Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To nullify the effect of the recent Executive order that establishes an "election integrity" commission, which will be used and is designed to support policies that will suppress the vote in minority and poor communities across the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/12/2017Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/12/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (74)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 07/12/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/12/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 07/12/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/13/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 07/13/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/20/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/20/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/20/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/20/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/26/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/07/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration07/12/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.