There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Voting Rights Amendment Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Voting Rights Act of 1965 to revise the criteria for determining which States and political subdivisions are subject to section 4 of the Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/13/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
08/03/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/13/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (89)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 07/13/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/13/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 07/13/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8]* 07/13/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 07/13/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/17/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/17/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/17/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/17/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/17/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/19/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 07/24/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/26/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/26/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/27/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 08/01/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 08/25/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 09/01/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/06/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/11/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/12/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/24/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 07/24/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 07/25/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 08/10/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 08/10/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 08/10/2018
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/27/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/13/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice08/03/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.