There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

FITARA Enhancement Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

FITARA Enhancement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

FITARA Enhancement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

FITARA Enhancement Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

FITARA Enhancement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 40, United States Code, to eliminate the sunset of certain provisions relating to information technology, to amend the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2015 to extend the sunset relating to the Federal Data Center Consolidation Initiative, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/21/2017Became Public Law No: 115-88. (TXT | PDF)
11/21/2017Signed by President.
11/09/2017Presented to President.
11/08/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7121)
10/11/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 0 (Roll no. 563).(text: CR H7956)
10/10/2017Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-344.
07/14/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
11/21/2017Became Public Law No: 115-88. (TXT | PDF)
11/21/2017Signed by President.
11/09/2017HousePresented to President.
11/09/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/08/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7121)
10/16/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
10/11/2017-5:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/11/2017-5:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 0 (Roll no. 563). (text: CR H7956)
10/11/2017-4:56pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7958-7959)
10/11/2017-4:14pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/11/2017-4:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3243.
10/11/2017-4:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7955-7957)
10/11/2017-4:00pmHouseMr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/10/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 249.
10/10/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-344.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
07/19/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
07/19/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
07/14/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
07/14/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/14/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 07/14/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 07/14/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform07/14/2017 Referred to
07/19/2017 Markup by
10/10/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-344

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.3243. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-88 (11/21/2017)

FITARA Enhancement Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill repeals the expiration date of (thus making permanent) provisions of the Carl Levin and Howard P. "Buck" McKeon National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2015 that require: (1) the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to make available to the public a list of each major information technology investment made by a covered agency for information technology, including data on cost, schedule, and performance; (2) the Chief Information Officer of each covered agency and the program manager of the investment within the agency to conduct a risk management review of those investments that have received a high risk rating for four consecutive quarters; and (3) the implementation by OMB of a process to assist the covered agencies in reviewing their portfolio of information technology investments.

(Sec. 4) The bill amends such Act to extend the Federal Data Center Consolidation Initiative through FY2020.