There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Project Safe Neighborhoods Grant Program Authorization Act of 2018

Other Short Titles

Project Safe Neighborhoods Grant Program Authorization Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Project Safe Neighborhoods Grant Program Authorization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Project Safe Neighborhoods Grant Program Authorization Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Project Safe Neighborhoods Grant Program Authorization Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Project Safe Neighborhoods Grant Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
06/18/2018Became Public Law No: 115-185.
06/18/2018Signed by President.
06/07/2018Presented to President.
06/06/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 394 - 13, 2 Present (Roll no. 239).
05/16/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
05/16/2018Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/14/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1573)
03/14/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-597.
07/14/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (29)

Date Chamber
06/18/2018Became Public Law No: 115-185.
06/18/2018Signed by President.
06/07/2018HousePresented to President.
06/06/2018-9:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/06/2018-9:40pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 394 - 13, 2 Present (Roll no. 239).
06/06/2018-2:35pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the motion to concur in the Senate amendment to H.R. 3249, the Chair put the question on adoption of the motion and by voice vote announced the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Goodlatte demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion until later in the legislative day.
06/06/2018-2:35pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
06/06/2018-2:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on the motion to concur in the Senate amendment to H.R. 3249.
06/06/2018-2:13pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
06/06/2018-2:13pmHousePursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 918, Mr. Goodlatte brought up H.R. 3249 and offered a motion.
05/17/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/16/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
05/16/2018SenateS.Amdt.2245 Amendment SA 2245 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/16/2018SenateS.Amdt.2245 Amendment SA 2245 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S2731-2732; text: CR S2731-2732) In the nature of a substitute.
05/16/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2731-2732)
05/16/2018SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/15/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
03/14/2018-3:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/14/2018-3:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1573)
03/14/2018-3:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3249.
03/14/2018-3:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1573-1576)
03/14/2018-3:38pmHouseMr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/14/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 454.
03/14/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-597.
11/02/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
11/02/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
08/17/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/14/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
07/14/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/27/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 02/27/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/14/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Markup by
03/14/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-597
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations08/17/2017 Referred to
Senate Judiciary03/15/2018 Referred to
05/16/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3249. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/14/2017)

Project Safe Neighborhoods Grant Program Authorization Act of 2017

This bill establishes the Project Safe Neighborhoods Block Grant Program within the Department of Justice's Office of Justice Programs to foster and improve existing partnerships to create safer neighborhoods through sustained reductions in crimes committed by criminal street gangs and transnational organized crime groups.