Summary: H.R.3250 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for H.R.3250. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/14/2017)

9/11 Immigrant Worker Freedom Act

This bill authorizes the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to adjust to permanent resident the status a qualifying alien who applies for adjustment not later than one year after enactment of this bill and who, after the September 11, 2011, terrorist attacks:

  • worked or volunteered on site in rescue, recovery, debris cleanup, or related support services in lower Manhattan, the Staten Island Landfill, or the barge loading piers for a specified number of hours during certain periods between September 11, 2001, and July 31, 2002;
  • was a vehicle-maintenance worker who was exposed to debris from the former World Trade Center while retrieving, driving, cleaning, repairing, and maintaining vehicles contaminated by airborne toxins for any time during such period; or
  • was a member of a fire or police department, worked for a recovery or cleanup contractor, or was a volunteer and performed rescue, recovery, demolition, debris cleanup, or other related services at the Pentagon site during the period between September 11, 2001, and November 19, 2001, or at the Shanksville, Pennsylvania, site during the period between September 11, 2001-October 3, 2001.

DHS may authorize an alien who has applied for adjustment of status under this bill to work during the pendency of his or her application.