There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Independence at Home Demonstration Improvement and Extension Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to extend the Medicare independence at home medical practice demonstration program.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/06/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-446, Part I.
07/17/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
12/06/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-446, Part I.
10/04/2017Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
10/04/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/13/2017Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
09/13/2017Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
07/31/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/21/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/17/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means07/17/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health07/31/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce07/17/2017 Referred to
10/04/2017 Markup by
12/06/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-446
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/21/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Markup by
09/13/2017 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3263. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (12/06/2017)

Independence at Home Demonstration Program

(Sec. 2) This bill extends, expands, and otherwise revises the Independence at Home demonstration program, through which comprehensive primary care services are delivered at home to Medicare beneficiaries with multiple chronic conditions.