There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Protecting Access to Diabetes Supplies Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Access to Diabetes Supplies Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act in order to strengthen rules in case of competition for diabetic testing strips, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/06/2017Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
12/06/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-447, Part I.
07/17/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
12/06/2017Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 329.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/06/2017Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/06/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-447, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/04/2017Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/04/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/13/2017Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
09/13/2017Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
07/31/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/21/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/17/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/17/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/17/2017 Referred to
10/04/2017 Markup by
12/06/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-447
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/21/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Markup by
09/13/2017 Reported by
House Ways and Means07/17/2017 Referred to
12/06/2017 Discharged from
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health07/31/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3271. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (12/06/2017)

Protecting Access to Diabetes Supplies Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to modify provisions relating to Medicare's competitive acquisition program (through which rates are set through a competitive bidding program rather than by an established fee schedule) with respect to diabetic testing strips. Specifically, the bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to:

  • use specified data to determine whether a bid satisfies certain requirements related to volume of coverage with respect to such products,
  • reject a bid if the bidder does not demonstrate its ability to furnish such products in a manner consistent with its bid, and
  • establish a process to monitor the extent to which an entity continues to cover the product types included in its bid.

The CMS may terminate a contract if it determines that an entity, for reasons other than product discontinuation or market-wide shortage, fails to maintain ready access to such products included its bid.

In addition, the bill specifies that an entity furnishing such products to beneficiaries under the program: (1) must furnish to each beneficiary a brand of strips that is compatible with the beneficiary's home blood glucose monitor, (2) may not attempt to influence or incentivize a beneficiary to switch the brand of either type of product, and (3) must contact and receive a request from a beneficiary no more than 14 days prior to dispensing a refill to the beneficiary.