There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Reclamation Title Transfer and Non-Federal Infrastructure Incentivization Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Reclamation Title Transfer and Non-Federal Infrastructure Incentivization Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Reclamation Title Transfer and Non-Federal Infrastructure Incentivization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to facilitate the transfer to non-Federal ownership of appropriate reclamation projects or facilities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 233 - 184 (Roll no. 325).(text: CR H6155-6156)
09/27/2017Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-334.
07/18/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/16/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/12/2018-5:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/12/2018-5:24pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 233 - 184 (Roll no. 325). (text: CR H6155-6156)
07/12/2018-5:16pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 187 - 230 (Roll no. 324).
07/12/2018-4:46pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6161-6162)
07/12/2018-4:01pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Huffman motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit, and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Huffman demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit until later in the legislative day.
07/12/2018-4:00pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
07/12/2018-3:56pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Huffman motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add a section at the end of the bill entitled "Prohibition Against Conflict of Interest".
07/12/2018-3:56pmHouseMr. Huffman moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Natural Resources. (text: CR H6160)
07/12/2018-3:56pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
07/12/2018-3:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3281.
07/12/2018-3:14pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 50 and H.R. 3281. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 50 under a structured rule and H.R.3281 under a closed rule. Each measure is allowed one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
07/12/2018-3:14pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 985. (consideration: CR H6154-6160)
07/11/2018-2:38pmHouseRule H. Res. 985 passed House.
07/10/2018-6:38pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 985 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 50 and H.R. 3281. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 50 under a structured rule and H.R.3281 under a closed rule. Each measure is allowed one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
09/27/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 242.
09/27/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-334.
07/26/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 12.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/26/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/18/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
07/18/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/27/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources07/18/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
09/27/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-334
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/16/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3281. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (09/27/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Reclamation Title Transfer and Non-Federal Infrastructure Incentivization Act

(Sec. 3) This bill authorizes the Department of the Interior to convey U.S. interest in an eligible reclamation project or facility to an agency of a state political subdivision, a joint action or powers agency, a water users association, or an Indian tribe or tribal utility authority that holds a water service contract for such property and that has the capacity to continue to manage the property for the same purposes for which it has been managed under reclamation law, if: (1) Interior notifies Congress in writing of the proposed conveyance at least 90 days in advance, and (2) Congress does not pass a joint resolution disapproving the conveyance. A facility that generates hydropower marketed by a power marketing administration shall not be eligible for such conveyance.

An entity that operates and maintains an eligible facility at the time Interior attempts to facilitate its conveyance shall have the right of first refusal to receive the conveyance.

(Sec. 4) Criteria for determining whether facilities are eligible for title transfer shall include: (1) the transfer will not have an unmitigated significant effect on the environment, (2) the qualifying entity intends to use the property for substantially the same purposes the property is being used for at the time Interior evaluates the potential transfer, and (3) the qualifying entity agrees to provide the United States the equivalent of the present value of any repayment obligation or other income stream the United States derives from the assets to be transferred.

(Sec. 5) No conveyance under this bill may adversely impact power rates or repayment obligations.

(Sec. 9) Interior shall submit, as part of its annual budget submission to Congress: (1) a description of the actions taken to implement this bill, and (2) a list of conveyances made or initiated by Interior or a qualifying entity under this bill.