There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

ELD Extension Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, with respect to electronic logging devices, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/18/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/19/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/18/2017Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/20/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 07/20/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/20/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/24/2017
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/24/2017
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/24/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 07/24/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 07/24/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/25/2017
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/25/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 07/25/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 07/25/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/25/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/26/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/26/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/26/2017
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/26/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/26/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/26/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/26/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 07/26/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/27/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/27/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/27/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/27/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/27/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 07/27/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 07/27/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/27/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/28/2017
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 07/28/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/28/2017
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/28/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 07/28/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 07/28/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 08/01/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 08/01/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 08/01/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 08/18/2017
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 08/18/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 08/18/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 08/18/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 08/22/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/05/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/05/2017
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/07/2017
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 09/11/2017
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 09/11/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/12/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/25/2017
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 09/25/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 09/28/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/03/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 10/03/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 10/03/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 10/11/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 10/19/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 10/19/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 10/23/2017
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 10/31/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/31/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/01/2017
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 11/02/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/08/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 11/13/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/29/2017
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 11/29/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 12/11/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 12/14/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 12/18/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 12/18/2017
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/12/2018
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 01/17/2018
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/14/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/05/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/18/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit07/19/2017 Referred to

As of 09/25/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3282 - ELD Extension Act of 2017.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3282. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/18/2017)

ELD Extension Act of 2017

This bill delays for an additional two years the effective date of regulations implementing the requirement that a commercial motor vehicle involved in interstate commerce and operated by a driver subject to federal hours of service (HOS) and record of duty status regulations be equipped with an electronic logging device to improve vehicle operator compliance with HOS regulations.