There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Carbon Pollution Transparency Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Director of the Congressional Budget Office to calculate a carbon score for each bill or resolution.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/18/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
07/18/2017Referred to the Committee on Rules, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2017Referred to the Committee on Rules, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/14/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 11/21/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 08/07/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 08/10/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 08/21/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Rules07/18/2017 Referred to
House Budget07/18/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3287.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3287. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/18/2017)

Carbon Pollution Transparency Act

This bill requires the Congressional Budget Office (CBO) to calculate a carbon score for legislation. The carbon score is the projected net greenhouse gas emissions that would result from: (1) enactment and implementation of a bill or resolution, and (2) the appropriation of any amounts authorized in the legislation.

The CBO must include the carbon score in cost estimates for reported legislation that are submitted to congressional committees pursuant to the Congressional Budget Act of 1974.