There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Northern Border Regional Commission Reauthorization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 40, United States Code, to promote regional economic and infrastructure development, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/28/2018Committee on Financial Services discharged.
11/14/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-1027, Part I.
07/18/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
12/28/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 863.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/28/2018Committee on Financial Services discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2018House Committee on Financial Services Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-1027, Part I.
04/12/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
04/12/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/12/2018Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
07/19/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/18/2017Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2017Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/18/2017 Referred to
04/12/2018 Markup by
11/14/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1027
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management07/19/2017 Referred to
04/12/2018 Discharged from
House Financial Services07/18/2017 Referred to
12/28/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3288. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/18/2017)

Northern Border Regional Commission Reauthorization Act of 2017

This bill provides that the share of the administrative expenses of the Southeast Crescent Regional Commission, the Southwest Border Regional Commission, or the Northern Border Regional Commission to be paid by each state of such commission shall be determined by a majority (currently, unanimous) vote of the state members of such commission.

A commission must include in the 40% of any economic and infrastructure development grant amounts provided to states or local governments, Indian tribes, or public or nonprofit organizations for the development of the transportation infrastructure, basic public infrastructure, or telecommunications infrastructure amounts for the development of renewable and alternative energy sources in its region.

Such economic and infrastructure development grants may be used to attract businesses to a region from outside of the United States.

The bill reauthorizes each commission through FY2023.