There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

CLASSICS Act
Compensating Legacy Artists for their Songs, Service, and Important Contributions to Society Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 17, United States Code, to provide Federal protection to the digital audio transmission of a sound recording fixed before February 15, 1972, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/19/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/19/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 07/25/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 10/25/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 10/25/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/21/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 01/20/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/20/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 01/30/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 01/30/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/30/2018
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/30/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/02/2018
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/02/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 02/02/2018
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 02/02/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 02/02/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 02/05/2018
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 02/05/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/05/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/05/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/07/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/08/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/08/2018
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 02/08/2018
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 02/08/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/13/2018
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/13/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/13/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 02/14/2018
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 02/14/2018
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/14/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/20/2018
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/20/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 02/20/2018
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/27/2018
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 02/27/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 02/27/2018
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 03/19/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 03/19/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/19/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/19/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3301. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/19/2017)

Compensating Legacy Artists for their Songs, Service, and Important Contributions to Society Act or the CLASSICS Act

This bill provides federal copyright protection for sound recordings fixed before February 15, 1972, specifically the right to make digital transmissions. Currently, pre-1972 recordings are only covered by state law.

Pre-1972 recordings will fall within the existing compulsory license system for digital transmissions, which currently only cover post-1972 recordings.

The bill preempts claims under state and common law for digital transmission of pre-1972 recordings.