There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Systemic Risk Designation Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Systemic Risk Designation Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Systemic Risk Designation Improvement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act to specify when bank holding companies may be subject to certain enhanced supervision, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/19/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 288 - 130 (Roll no. 694).(text: CR H10220-10221)
11/28/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-423.
07/19/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
12/20/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
12/19/2017-4:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/19/2017-4:50pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 288 - 130 (Roll no. 694). (text: CR H10220-10221)
12/19/2017-4:22pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
12/19/2017-3:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3312.
12/19/2017-3:11pmHouseThe resolution provides for consideration of the conference report to accompany H.R. 1. Additionally, the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3312, under a closed rule. The rule provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on both the conference report and H.R. 3312. Lastly, the rule provides for motions to suspend the rules through the remainder of the first session of the 115th Congress.
12/19/2017-3:11pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 667. (consideration: CR H10220-10229)
11/28/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 313.
11/28/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-423.
10/12/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 12.
10/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/11/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/07/2017HouseHearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit
07/19/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
07/19/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/24/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/24/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 07/24/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/26/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/26/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/26/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/28/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 07/28/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/28/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/28/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/28/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 08/29/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 08/29/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 08/29/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 08/29/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/07/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/07/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/07/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 09/07/2017
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 09/07/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 09/25/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 09/25/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/25/2017
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 09/25/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/25/2017
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/25/2017
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 09/25/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 09/26/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/26/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 09/26/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 09/26/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 09/26/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 09/26/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 09/26/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/06/2017
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 10/06/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 10/06/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 10/06/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 10/06/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/06/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 10/06/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/06/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 10/06/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 10/06/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 10/06/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 10/12/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/12/2017
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 10/12/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 10/12/2017
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 10/12/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/12/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/12/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/12/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 10/12/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 10/12/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/02/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 11/02/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/02/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/02/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 11/02/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/02/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services07/19/2017 Referred to
10/12/2017 Markup by
11/28/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-423
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit09/07/2017 Hearings by
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs12/20/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3312. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/19/2017)

Systemic Risk Designation Improvement Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act to allow the Federal Reserve Board (FRB) to subject a bank holding company to enhanced supervision if: (1) the company has been identified as a global systemically important company; or (2) the risk of the company's financial distress, or the nature of the company's activities, could pose a threat to the financial stability of the United States. Currently, companies are subject to this type of oversight if they possess at least $50 billion in assets or are a nonbank financial company under the FRB's supervision.

The Financial Stability Oversight Council must approve of any metrics used by the FRB in determining by regulation that a category of bank holding companies is subject to enhanced supervision.

Under this bill, companies subject to enhanced supervision may be required to limit mergers and acquisitions, restrict products offered, or maintain a certain debt ratio.

(Sec. 3) The FRB must publish the list of companies that have been identified as requiring enhanced supervision.

(Sec. 5) The bill provides for the temporary extension of fees and assessments collected from specified bank holding companies under current law, and includes a limit on the total amount collected under the extension.