There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Code Like a Girl Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the National Science Foundation to award grants to encourage young girls to participate in computer science and other STEM activities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/19/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
07/20/2017Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6046)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2017Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2017Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 07/19/2017
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/25/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 07/25/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/25/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/27/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/27/2017
Del. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/27/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 08/01/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 08/01/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/04/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 08/04/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/04/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/04/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 08/18/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/14/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/14/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/14/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/18/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/03/2017
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 10/19/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/26/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/26/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/26/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 10/26/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 11/03/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/06/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/16/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 02/13/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/05/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Science, Space, and Technology07/19/2017 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce07/19/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3316. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/19/2017)

Code Like a Girl Act

This bill directs the National Science Foundation (NSF) to award competitive grants to institutions of higher education, local educational agencies, or nonprofit organizations to accelerate research efforts to increase understanding of the factors that contribute to the willingness or unwillingness of girls under the age of 11 to participate in STEM (science, technology, engineering, and mathematics, including computer science) activities.

The NSF shall also award competitive grants to such institutions and organizations to enter into partnerships with local educational agencies to develop and evaluate interventions in pre-K and elementary school classrooms that seek to increase participation by such girls in computer science activities. The NSF must: (1) ensure that the materials developed under a program that are demonstrated as being effective in achieving grant goals are made available free of charge to the public on an Internet website, (2) convene an annual meeting of participating partnerships to foster greater national collaboration, and (3) furnish such partnerships with technical assistance in meeting grant program requirements.