There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

SAFE Act of 2017
Stopping Abusive Female Exploitation Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

SAFE Act
Stopping Abusive Female Exploitation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to increase the penalty for female genital mutilation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/05/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 0 (Roll no. 656).(text: CR H9637)
07/19/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/06/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
12/05/2017-1:45pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/05/2017-1:45pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 0 (Roll no. 656). (text: CR H9637)
12/05/2017-1:38pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9640)
12/05/2017-1:12pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/05/2017-12:56pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3317.
12/05/2017-12:56pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9637-9639)
12/05/2017-12:55pmHouseMr. Rutherford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/02/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/02/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
08/17/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/19/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
07/19/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 07/19/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 08/18/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/18/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 09/21/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 11/07/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/19/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Markup by
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations08/17/2017 Referred to
Senate Judiciary12/06/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3317.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3317. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/05/2017)

Stopping Abusive Female Exploitation Act of 2017 or the SAFE Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the federal criminal code to increase from 5 to 15 years the maximum prison term for an individual who is convicted of female genital mutilation.

(Sec. 3) It expresses the sense of Congress that states should have in place laws that require health care professionals, teachers, and other school employees to report to local law enforcement agencies any instance of suspected female genital mutilation.