There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Cuban Airport Security Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Cuban Airport Security Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Cuban Airport Security Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require a study regarding security measures and equipment at Cuba's airports, require the standardization of Federal Air Marshal Service agreements, require efforts to raise international aviation security standards, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
10/23/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8049-8050)
09/13/2017Committee on Transportation discharged.
09/13/2017Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
09/13/2017Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-308, Part I.
07/20/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/24/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
10/23/2017-4:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/23/2017-4:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8049-8050)
10/23/2017-4:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3328.
10/23/2017-4:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8049-8052)
10/23/2017-4:39pmHouseMr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/13/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 220.
09/13/2017HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
09/13/2017HouseCommittee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
09/13/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-308, Part I.
07/26/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/26/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/25/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/20/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/20/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/20/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/20/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 07/20/2017

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security07/20/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
09/13/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-308
House Foreign Affairs07/20/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/20/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation07/25/2017 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation10/24/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3328. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (10/23/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Cuban Airport Security Act of 2017

This bill directs the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to brief Congress and the Government Accountability Office on specified aspects of security measures at each of Cuba's 10 international airports

No U.S. air carrier that has entered into a covered agreement may employ a Cuban national beginning 30 days after enactment of this bill unless such carrier has publicly disclosed the full text of the agreement, and such nationals shall not have been recruited, hired, or trained by entities that are owned, operated, or controlled by Cuba's Council of State, Council of Ministers, Communist Party, Ministry of the Revolutionary Armed Forces, Ministry of Foreign Affairs, or Ministry of the Interior.

A "covered agreement" means a formal agreement between a U.S. air carrier with passenger air service between any location in Cuba and any location in the United States and the Empresa Cubana de Aeropuertos y Servicios Aeronauticos or any other entity associated with the Cuban government.

(Sec. 3) TSA shall develop a standard working document for all negotiations and agreements between the United States and foreign governments or partners regarding Federal Air Marshal coverage of flights to and from the United States. All such agreements shall be written and signed by the DHS Secretary. DHS shall notify Congress of any such agreement within 30 days of it being signed.

(Sec. 4) The U.S. Ambassador or the Charge d'Affaires to the U.S. Mission to the International Civil Aviation Organization shall pursue improvements to airport security, including introducing a resolution to raise minimum airport security standards.