There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XI of the Social Security Act to promote testing of incentive payments for behavioral health providers for adoption and use of certified electronic health record technology.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
06/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5033)
06/08/2018Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
06/08/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-720, Part I.
07/20/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
06/14/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
06/13/2018SenateReceived in the Senate.
06/12/2018-2:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/12/2018-2:44pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5033)
06/12/2018-2:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3331.
06/12/2018-2:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5032-5034)
06/12/2018-2:36pmHouseMr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/08/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 555.
06/08/2018HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
06/08/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-720, Part I.
05/09/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/09/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/25/2018HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/25/2018HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/25/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/20/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/20/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/20/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/20/2017 Referred to
05/09/2018 Markup by
06/08/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-720
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/25/2018 Referred to
04/25/2018 Markup by
04/25/2018 Reported by
House Ways and Means07/20/2017 Referred to
06/08/2018 Discharged from
Senate Finance06/14/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3331. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/12/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill specifies that the Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation may test models to provide incentive payments to behavioral health providers for: (1) adopting electronic health records technology, and (2) using that technology to improve the quality and coordination of care.