There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Bob Dole Congressional Gold Medal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To award the Congressional Gold Medal to Bob Dole, in recognition for his service to the nation as a soldier, legislator, and statesman.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/20/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/20/2017Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/20/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (89)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/25/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/25/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/25/2017
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 07/25/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 07/25/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/25/2017
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/25/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/25/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/25/2017
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 07/25/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 07/25/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/25/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/25/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/25/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/25/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/25/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/25/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/25/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/25/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/25/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/25/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/26/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/26/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/26/2017
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/26/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/26/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 07/26/2017
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/26/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/26/2017
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 07/26/2017
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/26/2017
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/26/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/26/2017
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/26/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/26/2017
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/26/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/26/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 07/26/2017
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/26/2017
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/26/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/26/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 07/26/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 07/26/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 07/26/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/26/2017
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/26/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/26/2017
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/26/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 07/26/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 07/26/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/26/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 07/26/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 07/26/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/26/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/26/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/26/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/26/2017
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 07/26/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/26/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/26/2017
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/26/2017
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 07/26/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 07/26/2017
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 07/26/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 07/27/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/27/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/27/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 07/28/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/28/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 08/04/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/04/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 08/15/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/18/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 08/18/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 08/25/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 08/25/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 08/25/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 08/25/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 08/29/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 08/29/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 08/29/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/29/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/05/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 09/05/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/05/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services07/20/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3332. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/20/2017)

Bob Dole Congressional Gold Medal Act

This bill directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the award of a Congressional Gold Medal to Bob Dole in recognition for his service to the nation as a soldier, legislator, and statesman.