There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Victims of Agent Orange Relief Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of State, the Secretary of Health and Human Services, and the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide assistance for individuals affected by exposure to Agent Orange, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/05/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
02/03/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs
01/25/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
01/05/2017 Referred to House Foreign Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/2017 Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/2017 Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/2017 Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/05/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs02/03/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce01/05/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/25/2017 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs01/05/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 06/26/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.334 - Victims of Agent Orange Relief Act of 2017.

Subjects (19)

  • Asia
  • Birth defects
  • Conflicts and wars
  • Environmental health
  • Foreign aid and international relief
  • Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
  • Health care coverage and access
  • Health information and medical records
  • Health programs administration and funding
  • Medical research
  • Medical tests and diagnostic methods
  • Military personnel and dependents
  • Public-private cooperation
  • Research administration and funding
  • Residential rehabilitation and home repair
  • Veterans' medical care
  • Vietnam
  • World health

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.334. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/05/2017)

Victims of Agent Orange Relief Act of 2017

This bill directs the Department of State shall provide assistance: (1) to address the health care needs of covered individuals, (2) to institutions in Vietnam that provide health care to such individuals, (3) to repair and rebuild substandard homes in Vietnam for covered individuals and their families, and (4) to remediate geographic areas of Vietnam that contain high levels of Agent Orange.

A "covered individual" is defined as an individual who is a Vietnam resident and who: (1) is affected by health issues related to Agent Orange exposure which took place between January 1, 1961, and May 7, 1975; (2) lives or had lived in or near geographic areas in Vietnam that continue to contain high levels of Agent Orange; or (3) is the child or descendant of such an individual and is affected by such health issues.

State and the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) shall provide assistance to support research relating to health issues of individuals affected by Agent Orange.

The Department of Health and Human Services shall: (1) make grants to appropriate public health organizations and Vietnamese-American organizations to conduct a broad health assessment of Vietnamese-Americans who may have been exposed to Agent Orange and their children or descendants; and (2) establish centers in U.S. locations where large populations of Vietnamese-Americans reside to provide assessment, counseling, and treatment for conditions related to Agent Orange exposure.

The bill amends veterans benefits provisions to provide benefits to the children of male (currently only female) Vietnam veterans who are affected by certain birth defects. The VA shall require any health care provider with whom the VA enters into a contract for the provision of health care to such children to provide the VA access to the medical records of such children for research into the intergenerational effects of Agent Orange exposure.