There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Sanctioning Hizballah's Illicit Use of Civilians as Defenseless Shields Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Sanctioning Hizballah's Illicit Use of Civilians as Defenseless Shields Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Sanctioning Hizballah's Illicit Use of Civilians as Defenseless Shields Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Sanctioning the Use of Civilians as Defenseless Shields Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To impose sanctions on foreign persons that are responsible for gross violations of internationally recognized human rights by reason of the use by Hizballah of civilians as human shields, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An act to impose sanctions with respect to foreign persons that are responsible for using civilians as human shields, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (10)

Date
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-348.
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/13/2018Presented to President.
12/11/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H10078-10079)
10/11/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
10/11/2018Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/25/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8178-8179)
10/24/2017Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
10/24/2017Reported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 115-367, Part I.
07/20/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (30)

Date Chamber
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-348.
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/13/2018HousePresented to President.
12/11/2018-4:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2018-4:10pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H10078-10079)
12/11/2018-4:10pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H10078-10079)
10/12/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/11/2018SenateS.Amdt.4059 Amendment SA 4059 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/11/2018SenateS.Amdt.4059 Amendment SA 4059 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Corker. (consideration: CR S6881; text: CR S6881) To amend the title.
10/11/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
10/11/2018SenateS.Amdt.4058 Amendment SA 4058 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/11/2018SenateS.Amdt.4058 Amendment SA 4058 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Corker. (consideration: CR S6881; text: CR S6873-6874) In the nature of a substitute.
10/11/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6881)
10/11/2018SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/05/2018SenateS.Amdt.4047 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
10/05/2018SenateS.Amdt.4046 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
10/26/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
10/25/2017-3:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/25/2017-3:40pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8178-8179)
10/25/2017-3:03pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3342.
10/25/2017-3:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8178-8183)
10/25/2017-3:03pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/24/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 269.
10/24/2017HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
10/24/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 115-367, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
09/28/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
09/28/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/20/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/20/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/20/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs07/20/2017 Referred to
09/28/2017 Markup by
10/24/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-367
House Judiciary07/20/2017 Referred to
10/24/2017 Discharged from
Senate Foreign Relations10/26/2017 Referred to
10/11/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3342. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/11/2018)

Sanctioning the Use of Civilians as Defenseless Shields Act

(Sec. 2) This bill states that it shall be U.S. policy to condemn the use of innocent civilians as human shields.

(Sec. 3) The President shall submit to Congress within one year, and annually thereafter, a list of:

  • each foreign person that is a member of Hizballah or Hamas or is knowingly acting on behalf of Hizballah or Hamas and knowingly directs the use of civilians protected by the law of war to shield military objectives from attack, and
  • each foreign person or agency or instrumentality of a foreign state that knowingly and materially directs or supports any such act.

The President shall impose U.S.-based property-blocking and visa sanctions, including revocation of existing visas, against a listed person, entity, or instrumentality.

The President is urged to submit to Congress within one year, and annually thereafter, a list of each foreign person or entity that knowingly directs the use of civilians protected by the law of war to shield military objectives from attack, excluding those foreign persons included in the most recent mandatory sanctions list.

(Sec. 5) This bill shall cease to be effective on December 31, 2023.