There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (8)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

SELF DRIVE Act
Safely Ensuring Lives Future Deployment and Research In Vehicle Evolution Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

SELF DRIVE Act
Safely Ensuring Lives Future Deployment and Research In Vehicle Evolution Act

Short Titles as Introduced

DECAL Act
Designating Each Car's Automation Level Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 49, United States Code, regarding the authority of the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration over highly automated vehicles, to provide safety measures for such vehicles, and for other purposes

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for information on highly automated driving systems to be made available to prospective buyers.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/06/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6667-6671)
09/05/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-294.
07/25/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
09/07/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
09/06/2017-12:07pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/06/2017-12:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/06/2017-12:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6667-6671)
09/06/2017-11:18amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3388.
09/06/2017-11:18amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6660-6667, H6677-6678)
09/06/2017-11:16amHouseMr. Latta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/05/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 212.
09/05/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-294.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/27/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 54 - 0.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/27/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/25/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
07/25/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/25/2017 Referred to
07/27/2017 Markup by
09/05/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-294
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation09/07/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3388. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/06/2017)

Safely Ensuring Lives Future Deployment and Research In Vehicle Evolution Act or the SELF DRIVE Act

This bill establishes the federal role in ensuring the safety of highly automated vehicles by encouraging the testing and deployment of such vehicles. A "highly automated vehicle" is a motor vehicle, other than a commercial motor vehicle, that is equipped with an automated driving system capable of performing the entire dynamic driving task on a sustained basis.

The bill preempts states from enacting laws regarding the design, construction, or performance of highly automated vehicles or automated driving systems unless such laws enact standards identical to federal standards.

The Department of Transportation (DOT) must require safety assessment certifications for the development of a highly automated vehicle or an automated driving system.

Manufacturers of highly automated vehicles must develop written cybersecurity and privacy plans for such vehicles prior to offering them for sale.

The bill applies certain safety exemptions and testing standards to highly automated vehicles.

DOT must: (1) inform prospective buyers of highly automated vehicles of the capabilities and limitations of such vehicles; (2) establish the Highly Automated Vehicle Advisory Council to, among other things, develop guidance regarding mobility access for the disabled, elderly, and underserved populations; (3) require all new passenger motor vehicles less than 10,000 pounds to be equipped with a rear seat occupant alert system; and (4) research updated safety standards for motor vehicle headlamps.