Text: H.R.339 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-53 (08/22/2017)

 
[115th Congress Public Law 53]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 131 STAT. 1091]]

Public Law 115-53
115th Congress

                                 An Act


 
    To amend Public Law 94-241 with respect to the Northern Mariana 
             Islands. <<NOTE: Aug. 22, 2017 -  [H.R. 339]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Northern Mariana 
Islands Economic Expansion Act.>> 
SECTION 1. <<NOTE: 48 USC 1801 note.>> SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Northern Mariana Islands Economic 
Expansion Act''.
SEC. 2. COMMONWEALTH OF THE NORTHERN MARIANA ISLANDS: TRANSITIONAL 
                    WORKERS.

    Section 6 of Public Law 94-241 (48 U.S.C. 1806) is amended--
            (1) in subsection (a)(6), by striking ``$150'' and inserting 
        ``$200''; and
            (2) <<NOTE: Permits.>> in subsection (d)(2)--
                    (A) by striking the period at the end of the first 
                sentence and inserting ``, except a permit for 
                construction occupations (as that term is defined by the 
                Department of Labor as Standard Occupational 
                Classification Group 47-0000 or any successor provision) 
                shall only be issued to extend a permit first issued 
                before October 1, 2015.''; and
                    (B) by striking `` `ending on December 31, 2019'.'' 
                and inserting ``ending on December 31, 2019, except that 
                for fiscal year 2017 an additional 350 permits shall be 
                made available for extension of existing permits, 
                expiring after the date of enactment of the Northern 
                Mariana Islands Economic Expansion Act through September 
                30, 2017, of which no fewer than 60 shall be reserved 
                for healthcare practitioners and technical operations 
                (as that term is defined by the Department of Labor as 
                Standard Occupational Classification Group 29-0000 or 
                any successor provision), and no fewer than 10 shall be 
                reserved for plant and system operators (as that term is 
                defined by the


[[Page 131 STAT. 1092]]

                Department of Labor as Standard Occupational 
                Classification Group 51-8000 or any successor 
                provision).''.

    Approved August 22, 2017.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 339:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 163 (2017):
            Jan. 30, considered and passed House.
            Aug. 1, considered and passed Senate, amended.
            Aug. 11, House concurred in Senate amendment.

                                  <all>