There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Teaching Health Centers Graduate Medical Education Extension Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize section 340H of the Public Health Service Act to continue to encourage the expansion, maintenance, and establishment of approved graduate medical residency programs at qualified teaching health centers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/25/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/28/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/25/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/25/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 07/25/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 07/25/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/25/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/25/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/25/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/25/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/25/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/26/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/26/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/26/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/28/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/28/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 08/11/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 08/11/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/05/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/05/2017
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/05/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/07/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/07/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 09/07/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 09/11/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/11/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/12/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/12/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/13/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/18/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 09/25/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/02/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/02/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 10/04/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/19/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/24/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 11/09/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/15/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/07/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/25/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/28/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3394. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/25/2017)

Teaching Health Centers Graduate Medical Education Extension Act of 2017

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to extend and expand funding through FY2020 for graduate medical education programs at teaching centers (which train medical residents in primary care specialties). The bill allows funds to be used for maintaining, expanding, and establishing graduate medical residency programs.