There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Safe Students Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal the Gun-Free School Zones Act of 1990 and amendments to that Act.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/12/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/03/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 02/02/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 02/02/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 02/02/2017
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 02/02/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/27/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 04/10/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/03/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations01/12/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.34. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2017)

Safe Students Act

This bill amends the federal criminal code to repeal provisions that prohibit the possession or discharge of a firearm in a school zone.