There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Recreation Not Red-Tape Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote innovative approaches to outdoor recreation on Federal land and to open up opportunities for collaboration with non-Federal partners, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/26/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
10/03/2017 Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
08/21/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
08/08/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
08/08/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/28/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/27/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/26/2017 Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/26/2017 Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/26/2017 Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/26/2017 Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/26/2017 Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/26/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/03/2017
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/03/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 10/03/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 10/03/2017

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/26/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands08/08/2017 Referred to
10/03/2017 Hearings by
House Agriculture07/26/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry08/08/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/26/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment07/27/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce07/26/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade07/28/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services07/26/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel08/21/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.